House | 05/08/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2762 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 176 | Journal Page: 2762 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2761 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2749 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2749 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |