Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2636 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo, Perry (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2636
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 1; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of money from the tax increment fund
 established for a tax increment financing reinvestment zone to the
 fund established for an adjacent zone.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 311.014, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Money in the tax increment fund for a reinvestment zone
 may be transferred to the tax increment fund for an adjacent zone
 if:
 (1)  the taxing units that participate in the zone from
 which the money is to be transferred participate in the adjacent
 zone and vice versa;
 (2)  each participating taxing unit has agreed to
 deposit the same portion of its tax increment in the fund for each
 zone;
 (3)  each participating taxing unit has agreed to the
 transfer; and
 (4)  the holders of any tax increment bonds or notes
 issued for the zone from which the money is to be transferred have
 agreed to the transfer.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *