House | 05/04/2013 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2462 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |