E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4247
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1109
|
Journal Page: 4247
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4247
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Perry
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|