House | 05/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |