E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 1/1/14
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#583
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amended
|
1-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Smith
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/6/13 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 772
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 772
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|