E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/22/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3705
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#940
|
Journal Page: 3706
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3705
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1269
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#303
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|