House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4)
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/3/13 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 774
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 774
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|