House | 05/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3073 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#790 | Journal Page: 3073 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3073 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Amended | 1-S. Turner and Zerwas | Journal Page: 3072 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3072 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Postponed | 5/10/13 11:30 AM | Journal Page: 3056 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3056 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2985 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#756 | Journal Page: 2984 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2984 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2984 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 6:00 PM | Journal Page: 2912 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 2791 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1981 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 775 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 775 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |