Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2766 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2766
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 14, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exclusion of certain flow-through funds in
 determining total revenue for purposes of the franchise tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 171.1011(g), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g)  A taxable entity shall exclude from its total revenue,
 to the extent included under Subsection (c)(1)(A), (c)(2)(A), or
 (c)(3), only the following flow-through funds that are mandated by
 contract or subcontract to be distributed to other entities:
 (1)  sales commissions to nonemployees, including
 split-fee real estate commissions;
 (2)  the tax basis as determined under the Internal
 Revenue Code of securities underwritten; and
 (3)  subcontracting payments made under a contract or
 subcontract entered into [handled] by the taxable entity to provide
 services, labor, or materials in connection with the actual or
 proposed design, construction, remodeling, remediation, or repair
 of improvements on real property or the location of the boundaries
 of real property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *