Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#746
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/9/13 12:16 PM
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2787
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2787
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2786
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Capriglione, Krause, Flynn, Simmons, Klick, Bohac, Taylor, Zedler, Howard, Dale, Springer, R. Mill
|
Journal Page: 2786
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2786
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|