Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#679 | Journal Page: 2777 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2777 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2777 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Technology | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |