Senate | 04/09/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 664 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | RV#117 | Journal Page: 1131 |
House | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#113 | Journal Page: 1098 |
House | 03/26/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Amended | 1-Moody | Journal Page: 1098 |
House | 03/26/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 12/14/2012 | Filed |