Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1339 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#385 | Journal Page: 2043 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2043 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2043 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Amended | 1-Toth | Journal Page: 1998 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |