E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3989
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3989
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1040
|
Journal Page: 3989
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3989
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3693
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#547
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 744
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 744
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|