Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2840 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Giddings (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2840
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2013, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2840 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the urban land bank demonstration program in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 379C.005, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 379C.005.  QUALIFIED PARTICIPATING DEVELOPER. To
 qualify to participate in an urban land bank demonstration program,
 a developer must:
 (1)  have built one [three] or more housing units
 within the three-year period preceding the submission of a proposal
 to the land bank seeking to acquire real property from the land
 bank;
 (2)  have a development plan approved by the
 municipality for the land bank property; and
 (3)  meet any other requirements adopted by the
 municipality in the urban land bank demonstration plan.
 SECTION 2.  Section 379C.009, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and
 (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), the [The] land
 bank must sell a property to a qualified participating developer
 within the four-year period following the date of acquisition for
 the purpose of construction of affordable housing for sale or rent
 to low income households.
 (b-1)  Before the completion of the four-year period
 described by Subsection (b), the land bank may, subject to Section
 379C.0106:
 (1)  transfer property that the land bank determines is
 not appropriate for residential development to the taxing units
 described by Subsection (b); or
 (2)  sell property described by Subdivision (1) to a
 political subdivision or a nonprofit organization.
 (b-2)  If after four years a qualified participating
 developer has not purchased the property, the property shall be
 transferred from the land bank to the taxing units who were parties
 to the judgment for disposition as otherwise allowed under the law.
 SECTION 3.  Section 379C.0106(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "eligible adjacent property owner"
 means a person who:
 (1)  owns property located adjacent to property owned
 by the land bank; and
 (2)  [has owned the adjacent property and continuously
 occupied that property as a primary residence for the two-year
 period preceding the date of the sale; and
 [(3)]  satisfies eligibility requirements adopted by
 the land bank.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 379C, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 379C.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 379C.014.  ADDITIONAL AUTHORIZED USE OF LAND BANK
 PROPERTY. (a)  Notwithstanding the other provisions of this
 chapter, the land bank may sell property to a developer to allow the
 construction of a grocery store that has at least 6,000 square feet
 of enclosed space and that offers for sale fresh produce and other
 food items for home consumption.
 (b)  To qualify to purchase property from the land bank under
 this section, a developer is not required to be a qualified
 participating developer but must obtain the municipality's
 approval of a development plan for the land bank property and must
 develop the property in accordance with the approved development
 plan.
 (c)  A sale under this section within the four-year period
 following the date of acquisition of the property by the land bank
 satisfies the requirement under Section 379C.009(b) that the
 property be sold within that period to a qualified participating
 developer.
 (d)  The land bank may sell property as provided by this
 section only after granting any rights of first refusal otherwise
 required by this chapter, and any completed sale under this section
 remains subject to the right of reverter provided by Section
 379C.009(d).
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *