E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1200
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4614
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4292
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2909
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|