Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3039 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3030 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3030 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 979 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 979 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |