Senate | 05/14/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1779 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1779 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2892 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#728 | Journal Page: 2891 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2891 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2891 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amended | 1-J. Davis | Journal Page: 2804 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2804 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 813 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 813 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |