E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3251
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4763
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4764
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1245
|
Journal Page: 4764
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4763
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4536
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2815
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2815
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2815
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2805
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2804
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 816
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 816
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|