Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB294 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 294
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain
 property owned by a charitable organization and used in providing
 housing and related services to certain homeless individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.18, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (p) and adding Subsection (p-1) to read as follows:
 (p)  The exemption authorized by Subsection (d)(23) applies
 only to property [improvements] that:
 (1)  is [are] owned by a charitable organization that
 has been in existence for at least 12 [10] years;
 (2)  is [are] used to provide housing and related
 services to individuals described by that subsection; and
 (3)  is [are] located on or consists of a single campus
 in [owned by] a municipality with a population of more than 750,000
 and less than 850,000 or within the extraterritorial jurisdiction
 of such a municipality.
 (p-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), the exemption
 authorized by Subsection (d)(23) applies to real property
 regardless of whether the real property is considered to constitute
 a building within the meaning of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *