House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |