Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#769 | Journal Page: 3051 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3051 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Amended | 1-Darby and Coleman | Journal Page: 3051 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2972 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amended | 3-Ritter | Journal Page: 2972 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Coleman and Darby | Journal Page: 2972 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2972 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |