House | 05/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 298 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 298 | |
House | 12/19/2012 | Filed |