House | 04/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 984 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 984 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |