House | 05/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 820 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 820 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |