E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4938
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1446
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#536
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Technology
|
|
Journal Page: 984
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 984
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|