Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3096 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3096
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the use of an emergency notification
 system by certain public service providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 418.192(h), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h)  The requirements of this section do not apply to:
 (1)  a public service provider serving 250,000 or fewer
 customers; or
 (2)  an emergency notification system that is in use by
 a public service provider on June 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *