Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3096 | |
2 | 2 | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; | |
3 | 3 | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business | |
4 | 4 | and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following | |
5 | 5 | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.) | |
6 | 6 | ||
7 | 7 | ||
8 | 8 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
9 | 9 | AN ACT | |
10 | 10 | relating to an exemption from the use of an emergency notification | |
11 | 11 | system by certain public service providers. | |
12 | 12 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
13 | 13 | SECTION 1. Section 418.192(h), Government Code, is amended | |
14 | 14 | to read as follows: | |
15 | 15 | (h) The requirements of this section do not apply to: | |
16 | 16 | (1) a public service provider serving 250,000 or fewer | |
17 | 17 | customers; or | |
18 | 18 | (2) an emergency notification system that is in use by | |
19 | 19 | a public service provider on June 1, 2011. | |
20 | 20 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
21 | 21 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
22 | 22 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
23 | 23 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
24 | 24 | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. | |
25 | 25 | * * * * * |