E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1068
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5037
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2910
|
Journal Page: 5035
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3602
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3254
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4281
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4281
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4281
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1417
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|