Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3116 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3116
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recovery of uniform statewide accounting project
 costs from state agencies and vendors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2101.001(1), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (1)  "Enterprise resource planning" includes the
 administration of a state agency's:
 (A)  general ledger;
 (B)  accounts payable;
 (C)  accounts receivable;
 (D)  budgeting;
 (E)  inventory;
 (F)  asset management;
 (G)  billing;
 (H)  payroll;
 (I)  projects;
 (J)  grants; [and]
 (K)  human resources, including administration of
 performance measures, time spent on tasks, and other personnel and
 labor issues; and
 (L)  purchasing.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2101.034(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The comptroller may recover from a state agency or a
 vendor that uses the system under Section 2155.061 the cost of
 implementation or use of any component of the project [by the
 agency].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *