Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3121 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Harper-Brown, Ratliff, Hilderbran H.B. No. 3121
 (Senate Sponsor - Deuell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 14, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for the exemption from ad valorem
 taxation for aircraft parts located in this state for a limited
 time.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.251, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsections (b), (c), (e), (g), and (k) and adding Subsection (l) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A person is entitled to an exemption from taxation by a
 taxing unit of the appraised value of that portion of the person's
 inventory or property consisting of freeport goods as determined
 under this section for the taxing unit.
 (c)  The exemption provided by Subsection (b) is subtracted
 from the market value of the inventory or property determined under
 Section 23.12 to determine the taxable value of the inventory or
 property for the taxing unit.
 (e)  In determining the market value of freeport goods that
 in the preceding year were assembled, manufactured, repaired,
 maintained, processed, or fabricated in this state or used by the
 person who acquired or imported the property in the repair or
 maintenance of aircraft operated by a certificated air carrier, the
 chief appraiser shall exclude the cost of equipment, machinery, or
 materials that entered into and became component parts of the
 freeport goods but were not themselves freeport goods or that were
 not transported outside the state before the expiration of 175
 days, or, if applicable, the greater number of days adopted by the
 taxing unit as authorized by Subsection (l), after they were
 brought into this state by the property owner or acquired by the
 property owner in this state. For component parts held in bulk, the
 chief appraiser may use the average length of time a component part
 was held in this state by the property owner during the preceding
 year in determining whether the component parts were transported
 out of this state before the expiration of 175 days or, if
 applicable, the greater number of days adopted by the taxing unit as
 authorized by Subsection (l).
 (g)  If the property owner or the chief appraiser
 demonstrates that the method provided by Subsection (d)
 significantly understates or overstates the market value of the
 property qualified for an exemption under Subsection (b) in the
 current year, the chief appraiser shall determine the market value
 of the freeport goods to be exempt by determining, according to the
 property owner's records and any other available information, the
 market value of those freeport goods owned by the property owner on
 January 1 of the current year, excluding the cost of equipment,
 machinery, or materials that entered into and became component
 parts of the freeport goods but were not themselves freeport goods
 or that were not transported outside the state before the
 expiration of 175 days, or, if applicable, the greater number of
 days adopted by the taxing unit as authorized by Subsection (l),
 after they were brought into this state by the property owner or
 acquired by the property owner in this state.
 (k)  Property that meets the requirements of Article VIII,
 Sections 1-j(a)(1) and (2), of the Texas Constitution and that is
 transported outside of this state not later than 175 days, or, if
 applicable, the greater number of days adopted by the taxing unit as
 authorized by Subsection (l), after the date the person who owns it
 on January 1 acquired it or imported it into this state is freeport
 goods regardless of whether the person who owns it on January 1 is
 the person who transports it outside of this state.
 (l)  The governing body of a taxing unit, in the manner
 provided by law for official action, may extend the date by which
 freeport goods that are aircraft parts must be transported outside
 the state to a date not later than the 730th day after the date the
 person acquired or imported the property in this state.  An
 extension adopted by official action under this subsection applies
 only to the exemption from ad valorem taxation by the taxing unit
 adopting the extension and applies to:
 (1)  the tax year:
 (A)  in which the extension is adopted if
 officially adopted before June 1 of a tax year; or
 (B)  immediately following the tax year in which
 the extension is adopted if officially adopted on or after June 1 of
 a tax year; and
 (2)  each tax year following the year of adoption of the
 extension.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a tax year beginning on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, to authorize a political subdivision of this
 state to extend the number of days that aircraft parts that are
 exempt from ad valorem taxation due to their location in this state
 for a temporary period may be located in this state for purposes of
 qualifying for the tax exemption is approved by the voters. If that
 amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *