House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 824 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |