E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5347
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1365
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5343
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5387
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3761
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4072
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2325
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|