Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1262 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#337 | Journal Page: 1919 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 12/21/2012 | Filed |