Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1437 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2288 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#480 | Journal Page: 2288 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2288 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2288 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2249 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#469 | Journal Page: 2248 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2248 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Amended | 4-Kleinschmidt | Journal Page: 2246 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2246 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Postponed | 5/2/13 3:50 PM | Journal Page: 2243 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Postponed | 5/2/13 4:00 AM | Journal Page: 2150 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Amended | 1-Villalba | Journal Page: 2149 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 299 | |
House | 12/21/2012 | Filed |