Senate | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 990 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#220 | Journal Page: 1603 |
House | 04/17/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1603 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Amended | 2-Carter | Journal Page: 1602 |
House | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1569 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1569 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1190 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 228 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 228 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |