House | 05/03/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2334 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#502 | Journal Page: 2334 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2334 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Amended | 2-R. Sheffield | Journal Page: 2333 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2333 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Postponed | 5/3/13 2:15 PM | Journal Page: 2283 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2282 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2265 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#470 | Journal Page: 2264 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Amended | 1-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 2264 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |