Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3289 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R2856 SLB-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 3289


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of professionals engaged in Texas
 pollutant discharge elimination system-related stormwater
 activity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 26, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 26.457 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.457.  TPDES-RELATED STORMWATER PROFESSIONALS;
 ADVISORY BOARD.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Stormwater" means rainfall runoff, including
 snow or ice melt during a rain event.
 (2)  "TPDES" means the Texas pollutant discharge
 elimination system.
 (3)  "TPDES-related stormwater activity" means
 professional, laboratory, training, contracting, or other services
 relating to the planning, development, implementation, inspection,
 construction, or monitoring of a stormwater pollution prevention
 project or activity requiring a permit issued by the commission
 under the TPDES.
 (4)  "TPDES-related stormwater professional" means a
 person who engages in TPDES-related stormwater activity and is
 required to be licensed under Subsection (b).
 (b)  A person who engages in a TPDES-related stormwater
 activity must hold a license issued by the commission under Chapter
 37.
 (c)  The commission shall appoint a TPDES-related stormwater
 professionals advisory board to guide, advise, and make
 recommendations to the commission about matters related to
 licensing of TPDES-related stormwater professionals. The advisory
 board is composed of:
 (1)  five members who are licensed as TPDES-related
 stormwater professionals, of whom at least four members must also
 be licensed as professional engineers with experience in civil
 engineering;
 (2)  two members who are active members of an
 organization promoting environmental protection; and
 (3)  two members who are active members of an
 organization promoting business interests.
 (d)  Section 2110.008, Government Code, does not apply to the
 advisory board under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.002, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 37.002.  RULES. The commission shall adopt any rules
 necessary to:
 (1)  establish occupational licenses and registrations
 prescribed by Sections 26.0301, 26.3573, 26.452, [and] 26.456, and
 26.457 of this code, Sections 341.033, 341.034, 361.027, and
 366.071, Health and Safety Code, and Section 1903.251, Occupations
 Code;
 (2)  establish classes and terms of occupational
 licenses and registrations; and
 (3)  administer the provisions of this chapter and
 other laws governing occupational licenses and registrations under
 the commission's jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  Section 37.003, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 37.003.  LICENSE OR REGISTRATION REQUIRED. A person
 may not engage in a business, occupation, or profession described
 by Section 26.0301, 26.3573, 26.452, [or] 26.456, or 26.457 of this
 code, Section 341.033, 341.034, 361.027, 366.014, or 366.071,
 Health and Safety Code, or Section 1903.251, Occupations Code,
 unless the person holds the appropriate license or registration
 issued by the commission.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2014, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall appoint the initial
 members of the TPDES-related stormwater professionals advisory
 board established under Section 26.457, Water Code, as added by
 this Act.  Notwithstanding Section 26.457(c)(1), Water Code, as
 added by this Act, the initial members of the advisory board who are
 appointed under that subdivision are not required to be licensed as
 TPDES-related stormwater professionals but are required to be
 licensed as professional engineers with experience related to the
 implementation by this state of the national pollutant discharge
 elimination system stormwater program.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality, in consultation with the TPDES-related
 stormwater professionals advisory board established under Section
 26.457, Water Code, as added by this Act, shall adopt the rules
 required to implement the licensure of TPDES-related stormwater
 professionals under Section 37.003, Water Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 26.457, Water Code, as added by
 this Act, a person employed as a TPDES-related stormwater
 professional is not required to hold a license under Section
 26.457, Water Code, as added by this Act, and is not subject to the
 imposition of a penalty for not holding a license under that section
 before January 1, 2016.
 (d)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 administer the first examination for the licensure of TPDES-related
 stormwater professionals under the rules adopted by Section 37.002,
 Water Code, as amended by this Act, not later than June 1, 2015.
 (e)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 publish the first roster of TPDES-related stormwater professionals
 as required by Section 37.014, Water Code, not later than January 1,
 2016.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Before June 1, 2015, the Texas Commission
 on Environmental Quality shall issue a TPDES-related stormwater
 professional license required by Section 26.457, Water Code, as
 added by this Act, to a person if the person submits an application,
 a fee, and any other materials required by the commission and:
 (1)  has at least three years of applicable experience
 relating to the Texas pollutant discharge elimination system
 stormwater program, including a minimum of two years in responsible
 charge;
 (2)  holds a bachelor's or graduate degree from an
 accredited college or university in a science or engineering field
 relating to the Texas pollutant discharge elimination system
 stormwater program;
 (3)  is a licensed professional engineer or a licensed
 architect;
 (4)  has a high school diploma or its equivalent and has
 seven years of applicable experience relating to the Texas
 pollutant discharge elimination system stormwater program,
 including a minimum of six years in responsible charge;
 (5)  holds an associate's degree from an accredited
 college in a science or engineering field relating to the Texas
 pollutant discharge elimination system stormwater program, and has
 two years of related experience, including a minimum of one year in
 responsible charge; or
 (6)  is a licensed geologist with two years of
 applicable experience relating to the Texas pollutant discharge
 elimination system stormwater program, including a minimum of one
 year in responsible charge.
 (b)  A license issued under this section is valid for two
 years and may be renewed in the same manner as a license issued to a
 person under the rules adopted by Section 37.002, Water Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.