Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3296 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raney (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3296
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rates of municipal and county hotel occupancy taxes
 in certain municipalities and counties and the use of certain
 revenue from those taxes; changing the rates of taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (i-1) and (i-2) to read as follows:
 (i-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (i), the tax rate in a
 county authorized to impose the tax under Section 352.002(g) may
 not exceed 2.75 percent of the price paid for a room in a hotel if:
 (1)  the convention and visitors bureau within the
 county executes a preferred access facilities contract with a major
 state university based in the county for the purpose of promoting
 tourism in the county;
 (2)  the county allocates, for payments to the
 university under the contract described by Subdivision (1) to be
 used for the renovation of a stadium located in the county and owned
 by the university, the portion of the revenue received by the county
 that is derived from the application of the tax at a rate of more
 than two percent of the price paid for a room in a hotel; and
 (3)  not more than 30 years have passed from the date
 bonds were originally issued by the university to finance a stadium
 renovation project for the stadium described by Subdivision (2).
 (i-2)  Subsection (i-1) and this subsection expire on the
 date the county commissioners court certifies that all debt issued
 or incurred by the university to finance or refinance the stadium
 renovation project described by Subsection (i-1), including
 interest and any costs relating to the debt, has been paid in full.
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.1034(b), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The county must spend at least 20 [45] percent of the
 revenue from the tax on marketing projects that directly promote
 tourism, hotel, and convention activity.
 SECTION 3.  Section 351.0035, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *