House | 05/09/2013 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 3006 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 3005 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3005 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 10:32 PM | Journal Page: 2991 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2991 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2991 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 832 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 832 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |