E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4879 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3907 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1447 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#462 | Journal Page: 2234 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2234 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2234 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2139 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2139 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 834 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 834 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |