E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3808
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5062
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1327
|
Journal Page: 5062
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5387
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3765
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3276
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3276
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4282
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4282
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4282
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1128
|
Journal Page: 4282
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4282
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Taylor
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1269
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#309
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amended
|
5-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Vo
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Riddle, et al.
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Isaac and Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Riddle, Fletcher, J. Davis, Laubenberg, McClendon, Sanford, Simmons, Harless, Ashby, Bohac, Kolkho
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|