Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3378 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Price, King of Hemphill H.B. No. 3378
 (Senate Sponsor - Seliger)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an annual term for the 47th District Court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.012, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), notwithstanding
 [Notwithstanding] any other law, each district court holds in each
 county in the judicial district terms that commence on the first
 Mondays in January and July of each year.  To the extent of a
 conflict between this subsection and a specific provision relating
 to a particular judicial district, this section controls.
 (a-1)  The term of the 47th District Court in Armstrong
 County begins on the first Monday in January.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.149(c), Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *