Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3056 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#775 | Journal Page: 3055 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3055 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3055 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2984 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2984 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Point of order overruled | Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 4, Section 41 | Journal Page: 2984 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2983 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 7:30 PM | Journal Page: 2938 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2938 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2938 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1225 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 229 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 229 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |