Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
House
|
01/03/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|