E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4292
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|