Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3439 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Otto, Button (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3439
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the representation of a property owner by an agent in a
 property tax matter.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.11(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  To be effective, a request made under this section must
 be filed with the appraisal district.  A request remains in effect
 until revoked by a written revocation filed with the appraisal
 district by the owner or the owner's designated agent.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 1.111(c) and (i), Tax Code, are amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The designation of an agent under this section remains
 in effect until revoked in a written revocation filed with the
 appraisal district by the property owner or designated agent.  The
 designated agent revoking the designation must send notice of the
 revocation by certified mail to the property owner at the owner's
 last known address. A designation may be made to expire according
 to its own terms but is still subject to prior revocation by the
 property owner or designated agent.
 (i)  An appraisal review board shall accept and consider a
 motion or protest filed by an agent of a property owner if an agency
 authorization is filed at or before the hearing on the motion or
 protest.  [If an appraisal review board designates a time and place
 for appearance before a hearing, an agency authorization is
 considered to be filed at or before the hearing if a copy of the
 authorization is filed at the time and place designated by the
 board.]
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *