House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |