Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3561 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murphy (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 3561
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the proceedings of certain municipal courts held in the
 corporate limits of a contiguous incorporated municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.104, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 29.104.  MUNICIPAL COURT PROCEEDINGS OUTSIDE CORPORATE
 LIMITS. The municipal court of a municipality with a population of
 3,500 [700] or less may conduct its proceedings within the
 corporate limits of a contiguous incorporated municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *